EP0138591 - Screening method for red blood cell abnormality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick New Jersey 08933-7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick New Jersey 08933-7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Robert A. 130 Balcom Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | 02 /
Kane, Richard L. 650 Landsdowne Way Apt. 204 Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 03 /
Price, Brandon J. 20 Maple Street Norfolk, MA 02346 / US | 04 /
Gershman, Russell J. 93 Plymouth Street Middlesborough, MA 02346 / US | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306988.1 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | US19830542221 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: US 542221 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138591 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138591 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
G01N15/1456 (EP);
G01N2015/012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aussiebung von abnormalen roten Zellen | [1985/25] | English: | Screening method for red blood cell abnormality | [1985/17] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation de globules rouges anormaux | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 28.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/15] | 12.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4021117 (GOHDE HILDEGARD, et al); | [A]EP0008874 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [YD]EP0009307 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [YD]US4263508 (LEARY JAMES F, et al); | [A]US4325483 (LOMBARDO IGINO, et al) | [A] - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 49, no. 12, December 1978, pages 1617-1621; New YorkUS; W.G. EISERT et al.: "Internal calibration to absolute values in flowthrough particle size analysis" |