EP0157040 - Method of producing transparent polycrystalline ZnS body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Motoji c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Shibata Kenichiro c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Shibata Kenichiro c/o Itomo Works of Sumitomo 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo / JP | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307052.5 | 15.10.1984 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | JP19830059866 | 27.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5986683 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157040 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157040 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/56, C04B35/00, // G02B1/02 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
C23C16/56 (EP);
C01G9/08 (EP);
C04B35/547 (EP);
C23C16/01 (EP);
G02B1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/41] | C23C16/56, // G02B1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von durchsichtigem polykristallinem ZnS | [1985/41] | English: | Method of producing transparent polycrystalline ZnS body | [1985/41] | French: | Procédé de production de ZnS polycristallin et transparent | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 17.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/31] | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2949512 ; | [AD]GB2090237 ; | [A]GB2039272 | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, vol. 66, no. 1, January 1983, pages 18-22, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.L. CHESS et al.: "Processing ternary sulfide ceramics: powder preparation, sintering, and hot-pressing" |