EP0138621 - Device for alphanumeric arabic display or printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naqib, Isam The University of Kuwait Physics Department P.O. Box 5969 Kuwait / KW | [1985/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307123.4 | 17.10.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | GB19830027856 | 18.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8327856 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138621 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138621 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138621 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
G09F9/302 (EP,US);
G09G3/04 (EP,US);
G09G5/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] |
Former [1985/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für arabisches alphanumerisches Anzeigen oder Drucken | [1985/23] | English: | Device for alphanumeric arabic display or printing | [1985/17] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage ou d'impression alphanumérique arabique | [1985/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.06.1990 | BE | 27.06.1990 | IT | 27.06.1990 | NL | 27.06.1990 | SE | 27.06.1990 | CH | 31.10.1990 | LI | 31.10.1990 | LU | 31.10.1990 | [2002/23] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 27.06.1990 | |
BE | 27.06.1990 | ||
IT | 27.06.1990 | ||
NL | 27.06.1990 | ||
CH | 31.10.1990 | ||
LI | 31.10.1990 | ||
LU | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.06.1990 | |
BE | 27.06.1990 | ||
IT | 27.06.1990 | ||
NL | 27.06.1990 | ||
CH | 31.10.1990 | ||
LI | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/52] | AT | 27.06.1990 | |
BE | 27.06.1990 | ||
NL | 27.06.1990 | ||
CH | 31.10.1990 | ||
LI | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | AT | 27.06.1990 | |
BE | 27.06.1990 | ||
NL | 27.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 27.06.1990 | |
BE | 27.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/24] | BE | 27.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2622169 (BROSE EL HAKIM); | [AD]GB2001468 (MORSE P, et al) |