EP0146236 - High speed solid state multiplexer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | ||
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states SPERRY CORPORATION 1290, Avenue of the Americas New York, N.Y. 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crocker, David Richard 120 E. Voltaire Phoenix Arizona 85022 / US | 02 /
Larson, Francis Willard 3502 St. Andrews S.E. Rio Rancho New Mexico 87124 / US | 03 /
Stelling, Desi Duran 19218 North 17th Avenue Phoenix Arizona 85027 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | ||
Former [1988/21] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [1985/26] | Singleton, Jeffrey Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307244.8 | 22.10.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830564259 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: US 564259 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146236 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146236 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146236 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/62 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
H03K17/6257 (EP,US);
H03K17/6264 (EP,US);
H04J3/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/26] | Title | German: | Festkörper-Multiplexer hoher Geschwindigkeit | [1985/26] | English: | High speed solid state multiplexer | [1985/26] | French: | Multiplexeur à vitesse élevée à l'état solide | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53012261 | [A] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 46, no. 562, December 1974, page 17, London, GB; D.J. BATTISON: "Analogue signal multiplexing without f.e.ts" | [A] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 50, no. 612, Mid-September 1978, pages 23-31, London, GB; D. BOWERS: "Analogue multiplexers: their technology and operation" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, page 765 E 78; & JP-A-53 012 261 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 03-02-1978, & JP53012261 A 00000000 |