EP0140688 - Silane perylene dyes, composite pigments obtainable therefrom, and processes for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marraccini, Antonio 4, corso Riviera Dormelletto Novara / IT | 02 /
Carlini, Filippo Maria 7, corso Torino Novara / IT | 03 /
Bottaccio, Giorgio 16, via Manin Novara / IT | 04 /
Pasquale, Antonio 8, corso Milano Novara / IT | 05 /
Maranzana, Giorgio 51, Strada Fara Novara / IT | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307399.0 | 26.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | IT19830023501 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: IT 2350183 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140688 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140688 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09B3/18, C09B69/00, C09B67/22, C09C3/12 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09B5/62 (EP,US);
C09B69/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/19] | Title | German: | Silanperylenfarbstoffe, aus ihnen erhaltene Pigmentmischungen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1985/19] | English: | Silane perylene dyes, composite pigments obtainable therefrom, and processes for preparing the same | [1985/19] | French: | Colorants de perylène silaniques, pigments composés à partir de ceux-ci et procédé pour les préparer | [1985/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/51] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3920695 (SMITH CARL MAYN, et al); | [A]FR2289574 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]GB2113704 (MONTEFLUOS SPA) |