EP0143574 - Assay method and kit for whole blood samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuk, Robert F. 837 Live Oak No. 3 Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307633.2 | 01.11.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | US19830548165 | 02.11.1983 Original published format: US 548165 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143574 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143574 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/52 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/80 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/962 (EP,US);
Y10S435/966 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Bestimmungsmethode und Testsatz für Proben von Vollblut | [1985/23] | English: | Assay method and kit for whole blood samples | [1985/23] | French: | Méthode de détermination et kit de test pour essais de sang complet | [1985/23] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 25.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0034904 [ ] (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | EP0051183 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | EP0066648 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | EP0100619 [ ] (SYVA CO [US]) |