EP0149314 - Conformable fascine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1988 [1988/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Defence Evaluation & Research Agency Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knight, Derek Ian 9 Thistlebarrow Road Bournemouth Dorset / GB | 02 /
Sullivan, Gilbert 1 Baytree Way Highcliffe-on-Sea Dorset / GB | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307689.4 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | GB19830032525 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8332525 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0149314 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149314 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E01C9/08 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
E01C9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Anpassungsfähige Faschine | [1985/30] | English: | Conformable fascine | [1985/30] | French: | Fascine adaptable | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3007023 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT); | [A]DE1758263 (SHAW ARTHUR HENRY) |