EP0148570 - Loose piece electrical terminals selectively plated and apparatus and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Mark Loring a4 Meadow Run Place Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17112 / US | 02 /
Wagner, Richard Maxwell 411 Fishburn Street Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17109 / US | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1985/29] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307697.7 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | US19830564279 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: US 564279 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148570 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148570 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148570 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
H01R43/16 (EP,US);
C25D5/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur selektiven Plattierung von elektrischen Kontaktstücken | [1985/29] | English: | Loose piece electrical terminals selectively plated and apparatus and method therefor | [1985/29] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour le revêtement sélectif de contacts électriques | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 09.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.1988 | BE | 19.10.1988 | CH | 19.10.1988 | LI | 19.10.1988 | SE | 19.10.1988 | [1989/46] |
Former [1989/35] | BE | 19.10.1988 | |
CH | 19.10.1988 | ||
LI | 19.10.1988 | ||
SE | 19.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/28] | CH | 19.10.1988 | |
LI | 19.10.1988 | ||
SE | 19.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 19.10.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2139037 (MECO METAL FINISHING ENG); | [AD]US4384926 (WAGNER RICHARD M) | Examination | EP0091209 |