EP0142974 - Cyanoacrylate adhesive composition containing tannins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Millet, George H. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84307843.7 | 13.11.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | US19830551294 | 14.11.1983 Original published format: US 551294 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142974 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142974 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09J3/14, C08F222/00 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F222/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/22] | Title | German: | Gerbstoffe enthaltende cyanakrylische Klebemittelzusammensetzung | [1985/22] | English: | Cyanoacrylate adhesive composition containing tannins | [1985/22] | French: | Composition adhésive cyanoacrylique cntenant des tannins | [1985/22] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4139693 (SCHOENBERG JULES E) |