EP0145314 - Antifungal triazole compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1985/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyle, Francis Thomas Hinstock Mount Astbury Lane Ends Congleton Cheshire / GB | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, John David, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Atkinson, John David, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307858.5 | 13.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | GB19830032788 | 08.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8332788 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145314 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, A61K31/41, A01N43/653 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C17/093 (EP);
C07C33/46 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D303/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C25/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Fungizide Triazol-Verbindungen | [1985/25] | English: | Antifungal triazole compound | [1985/25] | French: | Composés triazoliques antifongiques | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/31] | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0052424 [ ] (ICI PLC [GB]); | EP0096569 [ ] (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) |