EP0185805 - Building system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marcel, Antoine-Adel P.O. Box 35003 Bagdad / IQ | [1986/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Burrows, Anthony Gregory, et al Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory, et al Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | ||
Former [1986/27] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308021.9 | 20.11.1984 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185805 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/22 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
E04B2/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Bausystem | [1986/27] | English: | Building system | [1986/27] | French: | Système de construction | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1987 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 13.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/48] | Request for further processing for: | 17.12.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.01.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   18.02.1987 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.1992 | 30.11.1992 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1277974 ; | [Y]NL91586C ; | [X]FR1321543 ; | [X]FR955469 ; | [A]DE817505 ; | [X]BE508118 ; | [YD]USRE14904E |