EP0144216 - Removal of polychlorinated biphenyls by solvent extraction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRIC POWER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC 3412 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states ELECTRIC POWER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC 3412 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Way, Peter F 13 Campground Road Boxford Massachusetts 01921 / US | [1985/24] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/24] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308299.1 | 29.11.1984 | [1985/24] | Priority number, date | US19830559191 | 07.12.1983 Original published format: US 559191 | [1985/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0144216 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144216 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C10G21/00, C10G21/28, C10M175/00 | [1985/24] | CPC: |
C10G21/28 (EP);
C10G21/00 (EP);
C10G21/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfernen polychlorierter Biphenyle mittels Lösungsmittelextraktion | [1985/24] | English: | Removal of polychlorinated biphenyls by solvent extraction | [1985/24] | French: | Procédé pour enlever les biphényles polychlorés par extraction par solvant | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 13.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2071137 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP); | US4387018 [ ] (COOK GUS T, et al); | US4405448 [ ] (GOOGIN JOHN M [US], et al); | US4477354 [ ] (FESSLER WILLIAM A [US]) |