EP0146298 - Method and apparatus for separating filter aid from separated wax by selective permeation through a membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, John Arthur 581 Zone Street Wyoming Ontario N0N 1T0 / CA | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308368.4 | 03.12.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830557109 | 01.12.1983 Original published format: US 557109 | US19840666385 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: US 666385 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146298 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146298 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146298 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/00, B01D63/00, C10G73/04 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
B01D63/10 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP);
C10G73/04 (EP);
B01D2311/103 (EP,US);
B01D2311/14 (EP);
B01D2311/16 (EP);
B01D2313/143 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/26] | B01D13/00, C10G73/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/51] |
Former [1985/26] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtrennen des Filterhilfsmittels aus getrenntem Wachs mittels selektiver Permeation durch eine Membran | [1985/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for separating filter aid from separated wax by selective permeation through a membrane | [1985/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil de perméation sélective à travers une membrane pour séparer l'adjuvant de filtration à partir de la cire séparée | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2005334 (AMICON CORP); | [X]DE2527231 (DAICEL LTD); | [A]US4192732 (KOMINE KIKUJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0013834 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]EP0088459 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [XP]US4464494 (KING WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [AP]EP0125907 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) |