EP0147125 - On-load tap changer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Katsuaki c/o Itami Works of Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Hon-machi 8-chome Amagasaki Hyogo Pref. / JP | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Lawson, David Glynne, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1985/27] | Application number, filing date | 84308587.9 | 10.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | JP19830232979 | 08.12.1983 Original published format: JP 23297983 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147125 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147125 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/00 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
H01H9/0005 (EP,US);
H01H3/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | Last-Stufenwähler | [1988/30] | English: | On-load tap changer | [1985/27] | French: | Sélecteur de prises à charge | [1985/27] |
Former [1985/27] | Stufenwähler | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 17.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1638467 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK); | [A]FR2320623 (REINHAUSEN KG MASCHF [DE]); | [AD]GB2101810 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |