EP0146330 - Integrated circuit device with textured bar pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orcutt, John W. 3210 Collins Blvd. Garland, TX 75042 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308592.9 | 11.12.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830560766 | 12.12.1983 Original published format: US 560766 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146330 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146330 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/49503 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/26] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltungsanordnung mit strukturiertem Kontaktkörper | [1985/26] | English: | Integrated circuit device with textured bar pad | [1985/26] | French: | Dispositif à circuit intégré comprenant un corps de contact structuré | [1985/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/31] | 23.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58199548 ; | [X]JP56104459 ; | [X]JP55160449 ; | [X]EP0063811 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 44 (E-229) [1481], 25th February 1984; & JP-A-58 199 548 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 19-11-1983, & JP58199548 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 179 (E-82) [851], 17th November 1981; & JP-A-56 104 459 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 20-08-1981, & JP56104459 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 34 (E-48) [706], 4th March 1981; & JP-A-55 160 449 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 13-12-1980, & JP55160449 A 00000000 |