EP0145491 - Backporch gating pulse generator subject to disabling during vertical sync interval [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 30 Rockefeller Plaza New York, NY 10020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yost, Thomas Dale 9330 North Delaware Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Kennington, Eric Alasdair, et al RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Kennington, Eric Alasdair, et al RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | ||
Former [1986/34] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | ||
Former [1985/25] | Pratt, Richard Wilson c/o RCA International Limited Norfolk House 31 St. James's Square London, SW1Y 4JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308667.9 | 13.12.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | US19830561332 | 14.12.1983 Original published format: US 561332 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145491 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145491 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145491 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/72 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
H04N5/10 (EP,US);
H04N5/06 (KR);
H04N9/72 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/25] | Title | German: | Während des Vertikalsynchronsignals ausgeschalteter hinterer Schwarzschultergatterimpulsgenerator | [1985/25] | English: | Backporch gating pulse generator subject to disabling during vertical sync interval | [1985/25] | French: | Générateur d'impulsions de porte arrière déconnecté pendant l'intervalle de synchronisation verticale | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1181736 (FERNSEH GMBH) |