EP0149344 - Impact resistant bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abele, Wolfgang Paul 8101 Pleasant Ridge Drive North Charleston South Carolina / US | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Northover, Robert Frank, et al ESSO Chemical Limited ESSO Chemical Research Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Northover, Robert Frank, et al ESSO Chemical Limited Esso Chemical Research Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308839.4 | 17.12.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | US19840572730 | 19.01.1984 Original published format: US 572730 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149344 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149344 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F42D1/08 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
F42B3/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/30] | Title | German: | Schlagbeständiger flexibler Behälter | [1985/30] | English: | Impact resistant bag | [1985/30] | French: | Sac résistant à l'impact | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 14.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/24] | 31.01.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1003693 (DU PONT CANADA); | [X]GB1507152 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]US4196534 (SHIBAMOTO TOSHITSUNE [JP]); | [AD]US4369711 (LEADER HAROLD [US]) |