EP0150608 - Stent covering for tissue valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiley Inc. 17600 Gillette Avenue Irvine California / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states Shiley Inc. 17600 Gillette Avenue Irvine California / US | ||
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states SHILEY INCORPORATED 17600 Gillette Irvine California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ionescu, Marian Ian 357 Street Lane Leeds / GB | 02 /
Lenker, Jay Alan 259 Fairview, Laguna Beach Orange County, State of California / US | 03 /
Yang, Philip Shu-Cuan 125 Lakepines, Irvine Orange County, State of California / US | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William, et al Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Moore, James William, Dr., et al Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308927.7 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | US19830566133 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: US 566133 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0150608 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150608 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
Y10S623/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/32] | Title | German: | Rahmenüberzug für Herzklappen aus Gewebematerial | [1985/32] | English: | Stent covering for tissue valves | [1985/32] | French: | Enveloppe de support pour valvules cardiaques en tissu | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 03.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12) | 22.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2700531 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP); | [A]FR2038843 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE); | [A]DE1915178 ; | [A]US3755823 (HANCOCK W); | [A]US4084268 (IONESCU MARIAN I, et al); | [AD]US4172295 (BATTEN RICHARD J [US]); | [AD]US4364126 (ROSEN JONATHAN J, et al) | Examination | EP0133420 |