EP0147187 - Cleaning apparatus for charge retentive surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Ying-Wei 119 Hillrise Drive Penfield New York 14526 / US | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1985/27] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308948.3 | 20.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | US19830563729 | 21.12.1983 Original published format: US 563729 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147187 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147187 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
G03G21/10 (EP,US);
G03G2221/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/27] | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät für elektrisch ladungsfähige Oberfläche | [1985/27] | English: | Cleaning apparatus for charge retentive surface | [1985/27] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage pour surface retenant une charge électrique | [1985/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 16.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5430832 ; | [Y]US3848994 (FRASER L); | [AD]US4116555 (YOUNG EUGENE F, et al); | [Y]DE3022774 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK); | [A]EP0026677 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0036290 (XEROX CORP [US]) | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 7, no. 4, July/August 1982, pages 261-262, Stamford, US; J.R. LAING: "Magnetic brush cleaning system" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 52 (E-108), 7th May 1979, page E108; & JP - A - 54 30832 (CANON K.K.) 03-07-1979, & JP5430832 A 00000000 | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 8, no. 4, July/August 1983, pages 359-360, Stamford, US; N.R. LINDBLAD et al.: "Blade cleaner seal for magnetic brush cleaner" |