EP0147198 - Fermentation processes and their products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Biotechnology Limited 137 High Street Burton on Trent DE14 1JZ / GB | [1988/04] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states Bass Public Limited Company 30 Portland Place London W1N 3DF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molzahn, Stuart, William 91 The Plain Brailsford Derbyshire DE6 3BR / GB | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | ||
Former [1988/04] | Cannon, David Lovell J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1985/27] | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308981.4 | 20.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | GB19830034261 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8334261 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147198 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147198 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147198 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/81, C12C11/00, C12P7/06, C12P21/02, // C12N9/24, C12N9/86 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01073 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP);
C12N9/2405 (EP);
C12N9/2434 (EP);
C12N9/2471 (EP);
C12N9/86 (EP);
C12P7/06 (EP);
C12Y302/01023 (EP);
C12Y305/02006 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/27] | C12N15/00, C12C11/00, C12P7/06, C12P21/02, // C12N9/24, C12N9/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | Fermentationsverfahren und erhaltene Produkte | [1985/27] | English: | Fermentation processes and their products | [1985/27] | French: | Procédés de fermentation et produits obtenus | [1985/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2094341 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]EP0096491 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | [XP] - BREWERS' GUARDIAN, September 1984, pages 34-37; R.S. TUBB: "Genetic development of yeast strains" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 7, February 1983, page 179, abstract no. 47922r, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.A. IRVING et al.: "Development of an amylolytic Saccharomyces cerevisiae by genetic engineering", & PROC.-BIOENERGY R & D SEMIN 1982, 4th, 541-5 | [A] - AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 47, no. 11, November 1983, pages 2689-2692; I. YAMASHITA et al.: "Molecular cloning of a glucoamylase-producing gene in the yeast Saccharomyces" | [A] - CURRENT GENETICS, vol. 2, November 1980, pages 109-113; J.J. PANTHIER et al.: "Cloned beta-galactosidase gene of Escherichia coli is expressed in the yeast Saccharomyces cerevisiae" | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 19, 7th November 1983, page 164, abstract no. 153176f, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.A. CANTWELL et al.: "Molecular cloning and expression of a Bacillus subtilis beta-glucanase gene in Escherichia coli", & GENE 1983, 23(2), 211-19 | [APD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 23, December 1984, page 153, abstract no. 205283v, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. HINCHLIFFE et al.: "Expression of the cloned endo-1,3-1,4-beta-glucanase gene of Bacillus subtilis in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", & CURR. GENET. 1984, 8(6), 471-5 | [A] - ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY (USA), vol. 81, 1981, page 116, ref. H19; S.K. PICATAGGIO et al.: "The cloning of trichoderma reesei genomic DNA in Escherichia coli HB101" |