EP0185818 - Keyless steering lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/27] | Steering lock | ||
[1990/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOKUSAN KINZOKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-8-2, Kamata Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states KOKUSAN KINZOKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-8-2, Kamata Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nara, Etuo 3-17-7, Omori-Naka Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94 Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94 Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/27] | Daunton, Derek Barlow, Gillett & Percival 94, Market Street Manchester M1 1PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84309099.4 | 27.12.1984 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185818 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185818 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
B60R25/02153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/27] | Title | German: | Schlüsselloses Lenkschloss | [1990/10] | English: | Keyless steering lock | [1990/10] | French: | Verrou de direction non actionné par clé | [1990/10] |
Former [1986/27] | Lenkschloss | ||
Former [1986/27] | Steering lock | ||
Former [1986/27] | Verrou de direction | Examination procedure | 29.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 07.01.1987 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 26.03.1987 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5914551 ; | [A]EP0121165 ; | [A]DE2916559 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 100 (M-295) [1537], 11th May 1984; & JP - A - 59 14 551 (KOKUSAN KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 25.01.1984, & JP5914551 A 00000000 |