EP0185821 - Walking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.01.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ODETICS, INC. 1515 South Manchester Avenue Anaheim California 92802 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states ODETICS, INC. 1515 South Manchester Avenue Anaheim California 92802 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartholet, Stephen J. 1237 N. Christine Street Orange California 92669 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Massey, Alexander, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1986/27] | Application number, filing date | 84309105.9 | 27.12.1984 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185821 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B62D57/02, B25J5/00 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
B62D57/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/27] | Title | German: | Schreitendes Gerät | [1986/27] | English: | Walking machine | [1986/27] | French: | Machine se déplaçant en marchant | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/12] | 26.08.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57178977 ; | [A]GB952584 ; | [A]US4202423 | [X] - ROBOTICS AGE, vol. 5, no. 5, September-October 1983, Peterborough, New Hampshire, USA; M. RUSSELL "Odex 1: the first functionoid", pages 12,14-18 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 24, 29th January 1983, page (M-189) (1169); & JP-A-57-178977 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 04-11-1982, & JP57178977 A 00000000 |