EP0117171 - Amino derivatives of substituted pyridazines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI S.A. 40, Avenue George V 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states SANOFI S.A. 40, Avenue George V F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kan, Jean-Paul 25 Lotissement l'Olivette F-34100 Clapiers / FR | 02 /
Biziere, Kathleen 6, Lotissement Rayons d'Oc F-34170 Clapiers / FR | 03 /
Wermuth, Camille-Georges 3, rue de la Côte d'Azur F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400102.4 | 18.01.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | FR19830001029 | 24.01.1983 Original published format: FR 8301029 | [1984/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117171 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117171 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/20, C07D409/04 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
C07D237/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Aminoderivate von in Stellung 6 durch ein heterocyclisch oder ein alicyclisch substituiertes Pyridazin, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Heilmittel die sie enthalten | [1984/35] | English: | Amino derivatives of substituted pyridazines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them | [1984/35] | French: | Dérivés aminés de la pyridazine substitués en position 6 par un hétérocycle ou un alicycle, procédé d'obtention et médicaments les contenant | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2141697 (CEPBEPE) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 7, 14 février 1972, page 22, no. 41974h, Columbus, Ohio, US | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 1, 6 juillet 1970, page 199, no. 12845z, Columbus, Ohio, US | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 7, 14 février 1972, page 22, no. 41974h, Columbus, Ohio, US M.R. ORNELLAS: "Biochemical studies of cerebral subfractions after chronic administration of 4-methyl-3 (2-(morpholino)ethylamino)-6-phenylpyridazine hydrochloride, AG620" |