EP0117200 - Arrangement for the thermal transformation of a gaseous mixture containing hydrogen and hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states SPIE-BATIGNOLLES (société anonyme) Tour Anjou 33, Quai de Dion-Bouton F-92814 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states SPIE-BATIGNOLLES (société anonyme) Tour Anjou 33, Quai de Dion-Bouton F-92814 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cros, Pierre 167, Boulevard Murat F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Mingaud, Jean Louis 16, rue Monge F-75005 Paris / FR | 03 /
Plard, Christian 67, Route de Sartrouville F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | 04 /
Vanrenterghem, Jacques 110, Avenue Felix-Faure F-75015 Paris / FR | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1984/35] | Bouju, André 38 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400303.8 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | FR19830002764 | 21.02.1983 Original published format: FR 8302764 | [1984/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117200 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117200 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10G35/04, C10G49/00 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
C10G35/04 (EP,US);
C10G49/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur chemischen Umsetzung einer Wasserstoff und Kohlenwasserstoffe enthaltenden gasförmigen Mischung | [1984/35] | English: | Arrangement for the thermal transformation of a gaseous mixture containing hydrogen and hydrocarbons | [1984/35] | French: | Installation pour la transformation chimique d'un mélange gazeux contenant de l'hydrogène et des hydrocarbures | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 08.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.1987 | IT | 21.01.1987 | NL | 21.01.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.01.1987 | |
IT | 21.01.1987 | ||
NL | 21.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 21.01.1987 | |
NL | 21.01.1987 | ||
Former [1988/43] | NL | 21.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | US4166024 [ ] (SWAN GEORGE A [US]) |