EP0123569 - Tranquilizing device for stabilising the speed rate of a flowing fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states FLONIC S.A. 12, Place des Etats-Unis F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lett, Roland 2, rue Léonard de Vinci F-91330 Yerres / FR | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Ritzenthaler, Jacques SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES CENTRE DE RECHERCHE/SMR B.P. 620-05 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Ritzenthaler, Jacques SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES CENTRE DE RECHERCHE/SMR B.P. 620-05 F-92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/30] | Dronne, Guy Giers Schlumberger 12 Place des Etats-Unis B.P. 121 F-92124 Montrouge / FR | ||
Former [1984/44] | Dronne, Guy Giers Schlumberger 12 Place des Etats-Unis B.P. 121 F-92124 Montrouge / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400439.0 | 06.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | FR19830004197 | 15.03.1983 Original published format: FR 8304197 | [1984/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123569 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123569 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F15D1/04, G01F15/00, F16L55/02 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
F16L55/02 (EP,US);
F15D1/04 (EP,US);
G01F15/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Beruhigungsvorrichtung zum Regulieren des Geschwindigkeitsprofils eines strömenden Fluidums | [1984/44] | English: | Tranquilizing device for stabilising the speed rate of a flowing fluid | [1984/44] | French: | Appareil tranquilliseur pour régulariser le profil des vitesses d'un fluide en encoulement | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/37] | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.05.1985 | M02   Fee paid on   06.06.1985 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR466752 (STEPHAN SOC [DE]); | [A]FR893313 (KESTNER APP EVAPORATEURS); | [A]CH238569 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]); | [A]US2830617 (BROWN HAROLD L); | [A]US3043139 (WAUGH CHARLES C, et al); | [A]FR1395409 ; | [A]FR2018679 (DISA ELEKTRONIK AS DIS); | [A]GB1228223 ; | [A]DE2544457 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH) | by applicant | FR466752 |