EP0120779 - Control of the fluid pressure in a hydraulic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leorat, François Boulevard de la Reine F-78000 Versailles / FR | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Chassagnon, Jean-Alain, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT (S.0804) 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Chassagnon, Jean-Alain, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT (S.0804) F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400580.1 | 22.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | FR19830004636 | 22.03.1983 Original published format: FR 8304636 | [1984/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120779 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120779 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/11, B60K41/02 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
F16H61/20 (EP,US);
F16D48/06 (EP,US);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0022 (EP);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1068 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1085 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3067 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3108 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3111 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3166 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70217 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70235 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70406 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7041 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70418 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70605 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70668 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7101 (EP,US);
F16H2059/467 (EP,US);
F16H2312/02 (EP,US);
F16H59/24 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,US);
F16H61/0021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Steuerung des Flüssigkeitsdrucks in einer hydraulischen Vorrichtung | [1984/40] | English: | Control of the fluid pressure in a hydraulic device | [1984/40] | French: | Commande de la pression d'alimentation d'un récepteur hydraulique | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 05.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3765271 (DACH H, et al); | [X]US4282947 (KEMPER YVES J); | [A]FR2292895 (FRIESEKE & HOEPFNER GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2233893 (BERLIET AUTOMOBILES [FR]); | [A]FR2017651 (NIPPON DENSO CO, et al); | [A]FR2402128 (TS AVTOMOBILNYIAVTOMOTOR [SU]); | [A]FR1234304 (FERODO SA); | [A]GB2042658 (SRM HYDROMEKANIK AB) | Examination | EP0062458 |