EP0126658 - Heat-flow meter for monitoring heat-generating materials within a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourrelly, Paul 27, Boulevard Haguenau F-13012 Marseille / FR | 02 /
Patin, Henri 122 A., rue Ferrari F-13005 Marseille / FR | 03 /
Schoepp, Robert 11, rue Jean F-13004 Marseille / FR | 04 /
Sanson, Charles 2, rue du Poisson Bleu F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/48] | Application number, filing date | 84400729.4 | 11.04.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | FR19830006366 | 19.04.1983 Original published format: FR 8306366 | [1984/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126658 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126658 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01K17/00, G21F5/00 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
G01K17/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01K7/22 (KR);
G01K1/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Wärmeflussmessgerät zur Überwachung von wärmeproduzierenden, in einem Behälter aufgenommenen Stoffen | [1984/48] | English: | Heat-flow meter for monitoring heat-generating materials within a container | [1984/48] | French: | Dispositif thermoflux-métrique pour le contrôle de matières calogènes à l'intérieur d'un conteneur | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 21.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3022478 (FISH DONALD H); | [A]FR2140528 (SONNENSCHEIN ACCUMULATOREN); | [AD]FR2170795 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2243427 (PETIT JEAN LOUIS [FR]); | [A]US4346864 (FELLER MURRAY F) |