EP0126666 - Compositions used in dietetics, reanimation and therapeutics, containing a protein fraction based on 3 types of minipeptides, and their applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 35, Boulevard des Invalides 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 35, Boulevard des Invalides F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mendy, François 24, quai du 4 Septembre F-92100 Boulogne / FR | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Fritel, Hubert, et al Département des Brevets ROUSSEL UCLAF B.P. no 9 93230 Romainville / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | Fritel, Hubert, et al Département des Brevets ROUSSEL UCLAF B.P. no 9 F-93230 Romainville / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400806.0 | 20.04.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | FR19830006444 | 20.04.1983 Original published format: FR 8306444 | [1984/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126666 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126666 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A61K37/18 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
A61K38/018 (EP);
A23L33/18 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/48] | A23L1/30, A61K37/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen brauchbar in Diätetik, Reanimation und Therapeutik, eine Proteinfraktion auf Basis von 3 Typen von Minipeptiden enthaltend und ihre Anwendungen | [1984/48] | English: | Compositions used in dietetics, reanimation and therapeutics, containing a protein fraction based on 3 types of minipeptides, and their applications | [1984/48] | French: | Nouvelles compositions utilisables en diététique, réanimation et thérapeutique, renfermant une fraction protéique à base de 3 types de minipeptides et leurs applications | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 13.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3697287 (WINITZ MILTON); | [A]US3698912 (WINITZ MILTON); | [AD]EP0034083 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [A]EP0049666 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]); | [A]EP0055172 (DISTRIVAL SA [FR]); | [A]EP0065663 (MILES LAB [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 5, 31 janvier 1977, page 148, no. 27231p, Columbus, Ohio, USA; D.W. WEST et al.: "A study of the enzymic dephosphorylation of beta-casein and a derived phosphopeptide" & BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA 1976, 453(2), 383-390 |