EP0125981 - Process for the purification of dextrane saccharase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE Tour Aquitaine 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE Tour Aquitaine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, François 28 rue du Vivier F-31650 Saint-Orens / FR | 02 /
Monsan, Pierre Renoufail-Mondonville F-31700 Blagnac / FR | 03 /
Auriol, Daniel Rue Henri Barbusse F-66460 Maury / FR | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Ohresser, François Elf Aquitaine Division Proprieté Industrielle Tour Elf 92078 Paris La Défense Cédex 45 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Ohresser, François Elf Aquitaine Division Proprieté Industrielle Tour Elf F-92078 Paris La Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400909.2 | 03.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | FR19830007650 | 06.05.1983 Original published format: FR 8307650 | [1984/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125981 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125981 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
Y10S435/814 (EP,US);
Y10S435/816 (EP,US);
Y10S435/822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Dextransaccharase | [1984/47] | English: | Process for the purification of dextrane saccharase | [1984/47] | French: | Procédé de purification de la dextrane-saccharase | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4144130 (KULA MARIA-REGINA, et al); | [A]GB2079290 (FISONS LTD) | [X] - BIOSIS ARTICLE BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS/RRM 21051377, Philadelphia, US; A.W. MILLER et al.: "Stabilization of dextran sucrase from leuconostoc-mesenteroides NRRL B-512-F by nonionic detergents and poly ethylene glycol" & FEDERATION PROCEEDINGS USA) 1981, vol. 40, no. 6, p 1656 | [A] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 101, no. 1, 1982, pages 57-74, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Company, Amsterdam, NL; | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 23, no. 9, 1981, pages 2027-2037, John Wiley & Sons, Inc, New York, US; P. MONSAN et al.: "On the production of dextran by free and immobilized dextransucrase" | Examination | - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 101, no. 1, 1982, pages 57-74, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Company, Amsterdam, NL; G.L. COTE et al.: Isolation and partial characterization of an extracellular clucansucrase from Leuconostoc mesenteroides NRRLB-1355 that synthesizes an alternating (1-6),(1-3)-alpha-D-glucan" |