EP0128787 - One cylinder or multicylinder radial pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62 Boulevard Victor-Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maillochaud, Jean Claude 6, rue du Bois F-78370 Plaisir / FR | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton F-78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400928.2 | 07.05.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | FR19830009775 | 09.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8309775 | [1984/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128787 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128787 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F04B21/02 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
F04B53/1035 (EP);
F04B53/1032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Einzylinder- oder Mehrzylinderradialpumpe | [1984/51] | English: | One cylinder or multicylinder radial pump | [1984/51] | French: | Pompe radiale monocylindrique ou multicylindrique | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2443631 ; | [A]FR2006641 ; | [A]FR2004419 ; | [A]FR2348378 | Examination | FR1402284 |