EP0128814 - Hydraulic tensioner for belt conveying products in a freezing tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRIGOFRANCE S.A. Société Anonyme dite: Place de la Bastille Les Couets F-44340 Bouguenais / FR | [1984/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Cann, Robert J. 50, rue Clément Bachelier F-44400 Reze-les-Nantes / FR | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Moulines, Pierre, et al Cabinet BEAU de LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Moulines, Pierre, et al Cabinet BEAU de LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401134.6 | 05.06.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | FR19830009519 | 08.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8309519 | [1984/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128814 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65G23/44 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
B65G23/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Spanneinrichtung für ein Förderband in einem Gefriertunnel | [1984/51] | English: | Hydraulic tensioner for belt conveying products in a freezing tunnel | [1984/51] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique d'un tapis transporteur de produits dans un tunnel de congélation | [1984/51] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AT368469B ; | [Y]US4079834 ; | [A]US4128164 | [Y] - HYDRAULICS AND PNEUMATICS, vol. 29, no. 6, juin 1976, pages 66-67, Cleveland, US; A.J. STEVENS et al.: "Pressure switches control maximum/minimum conveyor-belt tension" |