EP0133064 - Method for the sequential analysis of different components in a biological sample in a single reaction vessel, and reagents therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BIOTROL 1, rue du Foin 75140 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BIOTROL 1, rue du Foin F-75140 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cam, Gilberte Rce du Parc 25 Rue du Dr. Bruel F-95380 Louvres / FR | 02 /
Besses, Gérard 2 Hameau de la Bonne F-95670 Marly la Ville / FR | 03 /
Uzan, Michel 9 Boulevard Pasteur F-93320 Pavillons S/Bois / FR | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401320.1 | 22.06.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | FR19830010422 | 23.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8310422 | [1985/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133064 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/52, C12Q1/54, C12Q1/58, C12Q1/60 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/58 (EP);
C12Q1/54 (EP);
C12Q1/60 (EP);
C12Q1/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [1985/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von verschiedenen Komponenten hinter einander in einer biologischen Probe in derselben Messvorrichtung und dazu verwendete Reagenzien | [1985/07] | English: | Method for the sequential analysis of different components in a biological sample in a single reaction vessel, and reagents therefor | [1985/07] | French: | Procédé pour le dosage successif de divers composants d'un prélèvement biologique à partir d'une même prise d'essai dans une même enceinte de réaction et réactifs utilisés | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 20.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/47] | 14.06.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2449280 ; | [A]EP0041366 ; | [A]US3925162 ; | [A]GB2050601 ; | [A]FR2433579 ; | [AP]FR2532326 ; | [A]EP0008341 |