EP0130920 - High-density composite based on discontinuous mineral fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.12.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1985/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rias, Jean-Claude 23 Domaine des Guérandes Medan F-78670 Villennes Sur Seine / FR | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401403.5 | 03.07.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | FR19830011164 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311164 | [1985/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130920 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130920 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/12, // (C04B26/12, 14:38, 40:00) | [1985/02] | CPC: |
D04H1/4218 (EP,US);
B32B17/02 (KR);
C04B26/12 (EP,US);
D04H1/587 (EP,US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
Y10S428/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verbundmaterial mit hoher Dichte auf Basis von diskontinuierlichen mineralischen Fasern | [1985/02] | English: | High-density composite based on discontinuous mineral fibres | [1985/02] | French: | Composite haute densité à base de fibres minérales discontinues | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.1989
05.04.1989
ADMISSIBLE ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S Hovedgaden 501 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK Opponent's representative Köhne, Friedrich Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.1989
05.04.1989
ADMISSIBLE ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S Hovedgaden 501 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK Opponent's representative Köhne, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Rondorferstrasse 5a D-50968 Köln / DE | 10.04.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.10.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.12.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/06] | Appeal following opposition | 23.07.1990 | Appeal received No. T0608/90 | 17.05.1993 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/20] | 12.07.1993 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/28] | 25.05.1994 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1994/22] | 03.08.1994 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/32] | 09.12.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.07.1992 | SE | 04.07.1994 | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/31] | CH | 25.05.1988 | |
LI | 25.05.1988 | ||
GB | 03.07.1992 | ||
SE | 04.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | GB | 03.07.1992 | |
SE | 04.07.1994 | ||
Former [1993/47] | GB | 03.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP8062259 ; | [X]PL107654 ; | [X]JP5870760 ; | [A]US4073230 (AKERSON DAVID WALLACE); | [X]FR2475970 (VOISIN & PASCAL CARTON [FR]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 14, octobre 1980, page 263, no. 136737y, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 80 62259 (ASAHI FIBER GLASS CO., LTD.) 10-05-1980, & JP8062259 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 6, 10 août 1981, page 306, no. 47989f, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & PL - A - 107 654 (CENTRALNY OSRODEK BADAWCZO-ROZWOJOWY PRZEMYSLU IZOLACJI BUDOWLANEJ, PL), 29-11-1980, & PL107654 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 22, 1983, page 285, no. 180450x, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP - A - 58 70760 (ASAHI FIBER GLASS CO., LTD.) 27-04-1983, & JP5870760 A 00000000 |