EP0130923 - Method of making a connection between superconducting wires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/02] | Method of making a connection between superconducting wires, and connection obtained by this method | ||
[1987/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissement Public dit: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states Etablissement Public dit: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaussy, Jacques 20, Allée François Villon F-38130 Echirolles / FR | 02 /
Genicon, Jean-Louis Cédex 258 Crolles F-38190 Brigoud / FR | 03 /
Mazuer, Jean 460, avenue de Stalingrad F-38340 Voreppe / FR | 04 /
Pilon, Jean 18, rue Marcel Peretto F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 05 /
Sulpice, André F-73470 Novalaise / FR | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | [1985/02] | Application number, filing date | 84401417.5 | 04.07.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | FR19830011147 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311147 | [1985/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130923 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130923 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/68, H01L39/02 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
H01R4/68 (EP,US);
H10N60/80 (EP,US);
Y10S505/925 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49199 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verbindung zwischen Supraleitern | [1987/38] | English: | Method of making a connection between superconducting wires | [1987/38] | French: | Procédé pour réaliser une connexion entre fils supraconducteurs | [1987/38] |
Former [1985/02] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verbindung zwischen Supraleiter und durch dieses Verfahren hergestellte Verbindung | ||
Former [1985/02] | Method of making a connection between superconducting wires, and connection obtained by this method | ||
Former [1985/02] | Procédé pour réaliser une connexion entre fils supraconducteurs et connexion obtenue par ce procédé | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.09.1987 | [1989/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1073207 (MULLARD LTD); | [A]US3422529 (NUDING JAMES M); | [A]FR1585965 ; | [AD]GB1298068 (BRITISH OXYGEN CO LTD [GB]); | [A]WO8002084 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH SYMPOSIUM ON ENGINEERING PROBLEMS OF FUSION RESEARCH, 18-21 novembre 1975, San Diego, Cal., pages 106-110, IEEE, New York, US; D.N. CORNISH et al.: "Explosive joints in Nb-Ti/Cu composite superconductors" |