EP0133128 - Overcurrent protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolas, Bernard Résidence du Petit Bel Ebat Pavillon 44 F-77210 Avon / FR | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401561.0 | 25.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | FR19830012264 | 25.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8312264 | [1985/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133128 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133128 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/04, H02H3/08 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
H02H1/04 (EP,US);
H02H3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1985/07] | Title | German: | Überstromschutzeinrichtung | [1985/07] | English: | Overcurrent protection device | [1985/07] | French: | Dispositif de protection à surintensité de courant | [1985/07] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 24.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE1815200 (ELIN UNION AG); | [YD]DE2446447 (DEUTSCHE BUNDESBAHN); | [Y]DE2334165 (HARTMANN & BRAUN AG); | [A]FR2239791 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |