EP0133403 - Necleotide sequence coding for the signal peptide of diphteria toxine, vector containing this nucleotide sequence, its use in the transformation of microorganisms and peptide compositions obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | |||
Former [1985/08] | For all designated states GROUPEMENT DE GENIE GENETIQUE (G3) 28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaczorek, Michel 6, rue Mayran F-75009 Paris / FR | 02 /
Tiollais, Pierre 16, rue de la Glacière F-75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
Chenciner, Nicole 11, Quai Bourbon F-75004 Paris / FR | 04 /
Streeck, Rolf E. 17 bis, avenue Foch F-75116 Paris / FR | 05 /
Boquet, Patrice 1, rue du Puits Georget F-94000 Creteil / FR | [1985/08] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/08] | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401593.3 | 30.07.1984 | [1985/08] | Priority number, date | FR19830012597 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8312597 | [1985/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0133403 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0133403 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12P21/02, C07K7/04, C07H21/04, C12N1/20, A61K39/05, A61K39/385, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:16, 1:19) | [1985/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/34 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N15/77 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/08] | Title | German: | Für das Signalpeptid von Diphtherie-Toxin kodierende Nukleotid-Sequenz, diese Nukleotid-Sequenz enthaltender Vektor, deren Verwendung bei der Transformation von Mikroorganismen und die erhaltenen Peptid-Zusammensetzungen | [1985/08] | English: | Necleotide sequence coding for the signal peptide of diphteria toxine, vector containing this nucleotide sequence, its use in the transformation of microorganisms and peptide compositions obtained | [1985/08] | French: | Séquence nucléotidique codant pour le peptide signal de la toxine diphtérique, vecteur contenant cette séquence nucléotidique, leur application à la transformation de micro-organismes et compositions peptidiques obtenues | [1985/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/38] | 01.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/38] | Request for further processing for: | 29.02.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8303971 ; | [A]EP0006694 | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 220, 29 avril 1983, pages 515-517, Washington, D.C., US; D. LEONG et al.: "Cloned fragment A of diphtheria toxin is expressed and secreted into the periplasmic space of Escherichia coli K12" | [XD] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 141, no. 1, janvier 1980, pages 184-189; W.P. SMITH et al.: "Precursor in cotranslational secretion of diphtheria toxin" | [XP] - SCIENCE, vol. 221, 26 août 1983, pages 855-858; M. KACZOREK et al.: "Nucleotide sequence and expression of the Diphtheria tox228 gene in Escherichia coli" | [A] - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 42, no. 2, mai 1982, pages 510-518; J.L. MICHEL et al.: "Restriction endonuclease map of the nontoxigenic corynephage gamma-c and its relationship to the toxigenic corynephage beta-c" | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 148, no. 1, octobre 1981, pages 153-162; G.A. BUCK et al.: "Identification of deoxyribonucleic acid restriction fragments of beta-converting corynebacteriophages that carry the gene for diphtheria toxin" | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 148, octobre 1981, pages 124-130; J.J. COSTA et al.: "Restriction map of corynebacteriophages beta-c and beta-vir and physical localization of the diphtheria tox operon" | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 141, mars 1980, pages 1142-1147; W.P. SMITH: "Cotranslational secretion of diphtheria toxin and alkaline phosphatase in vitro: Involvement of membrane protein" |