EP0133408 - System for determining the course of a marine structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Possemé, Gilles THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1985/08] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401629.5 | 03.08.1984 | [1985/08] | Priority number, date | FR19830012899 | 04.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8312899 | [1985/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133408 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133408 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/08, B63G9/06, G01C21/04, G01S1/70, B63B51/00 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
B63G9/06 (EP,US);
G01R33/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/08] | G01V3/08, B63G9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1985/08] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Fahrwegbestimmung eines Marineschiffes | [1985/08] | English: | System for determining the course of a marine structure | [1985/08] | French: | Système de trajectographie d'un bâtiment naval | [1985/08] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 16.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1058648 [ ] (PHIL ALEXANDER GIBSONE DERZEIT); | US3412371 [ ] (SHOSTAK ARNOLD A); | FR2354589 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | GB2105135 [ ] (WILCOCK NORMAN BRIAN) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, vol. GE-19, no. 4, octobre 1981, pages 235-243, IEEE, New York, US; F.H. RAAB: "Quasi-static magnetic-field technique for determining position and orientation" |