EP0143016 - Derivatives of 4-(3-alkynyloxy-2-hydroxy-propyl)-piperazin-1-yl-N-phenyl acetamide, their preparation and their therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIOM LABORATOIRES- C.E.R.M. "R.L.-CERM" - (S.A.) Route de Marsat B.P. 140 F-63203 Riom Cédex / FR | [1985/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Combourieu, Michel 6, rue du Mont Mouchet F-15000 Aurillac / FR | 02 /
Laigle, Jean-Claude 31, Avenue Aristide Briand F-15000 Aurillac / FR | 03 /
Reyjal, Jean-François La Course du Mouton Roannes Saint-Mary F-15220 Saint-Mamet La Salvetat / FR | 04 /
Landes, Marie-Paule 20, Avenue de la Liberté F-15000 Aurillac / FR | [1987/31] |
Former [1985/22] | 01 /
Combourieu, Michel 6, rue du Mont Mouchet F-15000 Aurillac / FR | ||
02 /
Laigle, Jean-Claude 31, Avenue Aristide Briand F-15000 Aurillac / FR | |||
03 /
Reyjal, Jean-François La Course du Mouton Roannes Saint Mary F-15220 Saint Mamet La Salvetat / FR | |||
04 /
Landes, Marie-Paule 20, Avenue de la Liberté F-15000 Aurillac / FR | Representative(s) | Thérond, Gérard Raymond, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Thérond, Gérard Raymond, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 84401824.2 | 14.09.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | FR19830014720 | 15.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314720 | [1985/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143016 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143016 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/14, A61K31/495 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
C07D295/15 (EP);
C07D295/04 (KR);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Derivate von 4-(3-Alkynyloxy-2-hydroxy-propyl)-piperazin-1-yl-N-phenylacetamid, ihre Herstellung und ihre therapeutische Verwendung | [1985/22] | English: | Derivatives of 4-(3-alkynyloxy-2-hydroxy-propyl)-piperazin-1-yl-N-phenyl acetamide, their preparation and their therapeutical use | [1985/22] | French: | Dérivés de 4-(3-alkynyloxy-2-hydroxy-propyl)-piperazin-1-yl-N-phényl acétamide, leur préparation et leur application en thérapeutique | [1987/31] |
Former [1985/22] | Dérivés de 4-(3-alkynyloxy-2-hydroxy-propyl)-piperazin-1-YL-N-phenyl acetamide, leur préparation et leur application en therapeutique | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 13.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2173869 (CERM CENT EUROP RECH MAUVERNAY [FR]); | [Y]EP0000299 (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]) |