EP0136954 - Process for using laminated sheets for the construction of interior walls of houses, decorations, furniture elements and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AARKA Société à responsabilité limitée dite: 1bis Rue Théodule Ribot F-75017 Paris / FR | For all designated states POLYREY Société Anonyme dite: 1, Rue du Petit-Clamart 78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states AARKA Société à responsabilité limitée dite: 1bis Rue Théodule Ribot F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states POLYREY Société Anonyme dite: 1, Rue du Petit-Clamart F-78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morvan, Erik 53 Boulevard Suchet F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Loyer, Jacques 16, rue de la Maison Rouge F-92190 Meudon / FR | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84401954.7 | 28.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | FR19830015680 | 30.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8315680 | [1985/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136954 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136954 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136954 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/04, B44C7/02 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
E04B9/0428 (EP);
B44C7/022 (EP);
E04B9/22 (EP);
E04B2009/0492 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/15] | E04B5/54, B44C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Gebrauch von Schichtstoffen für den Aufbau von Innenwänden für Wohnungen, Dekorationen, Möbelelemente und dergleichen | [1985/28] | English: | Process for using laminated sheets for the construction of interior walls of houses, decorations, furniture elements and the like | [1985/28] | French: | Procédé pour l'utilisation de feuilles de stratifié pour la constitution de parois internes d'habitations, de décors, d'éléments d'ameublement et similaires | [1985/15] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1328191 ; | [Y]FR1475446 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]FR2028427 (DELBOSCO GIOVANNI, et al); | [Y]FR2095463 (MODERN VILLA AGENCEMENT); | [A]FR2154288 (DUDLEY A AND SONS LTD); | [A]FR2190135 (TOMBU GERARD [FR]); | [Y]FR2355674 (KRISS MICHEL [FR]); | [A]US4083153 (SUMPTER GARY T) |