EP0143025 - Bistable electromagnet with several armatures having a permanent magnet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEMECANIQUE 43-45 Boulevard Franklin Roosevelt F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [1985/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koehler, Gérard 46 rue de Sèvres F-92410 Ville d'Avray / FR | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1985/22] | Bouju, André 38 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402035.4 | 10.10.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | FR19830018186 | 16.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8318186 | [1985/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143025 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143025 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143025 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/08 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
H01F7/08 (EP,US);
F16D27/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Bistabiler Elektromagnet mit mehreren mit einem Permanentmagneten versehenen Ankern | [1985/22] | English: | Bistable electromagnet with several armatures having a permanent magnet | [1985/22] | French: | Electro-aimant bistable à plusieurs armatures comprenant un aimant permanent | [1985/22] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 16.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2520152 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [AD]FR2388386 (FRANCAISE APP ELECT MESURE [FR]); | [A]FR2358006 (MANUF FSE APP ELECTR [FR]); | [A]FR1417292 |