EP0139586 - Thermal regulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/18] | Thermostatic regulation device modifications | ||
[1990/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAUPHINOISE THOMSON Société anonyme dite: 40, rue Marcel Peretto F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [1985/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nouvelle, Robert Malhivert F-38640 Claix / FR | 02 /
Segura, Jean-Louis 2, Avenue John Kennedy F-38500 Voiron / FR | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84402039.6 | 10.10.1984 | [1985/18] | Priority number, date | FR19830016159 | 11.10.1983 Original published format: FR 8316159 | [1985/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139586 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139586 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
G05D23/30 (EP,US);
G05D23/1921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | Thermische Steuervorrichtung | [1990/05] | English: | Thermal regulation device | [1990/05] | French: | Dispositif de commande thermique | [1990/05] |
Former [1985/18] | Thermostatische Regelungsvorrichtungen | ||
Former [1985/18] | Thermostatic regulation device modifications | ||
Former [1985/18] | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs de régulation thermostatiques | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/05: Demande divisionnaire 88103053 déposée le 01.03.88 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 08.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88103053.0 / EP0276028 | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2777662 (HANSEN GEORGE E); | [X]US3029595 (SHERWOOD JOHN F); | [A]US3263411 (CARLSON JR WILLIAM L, et al); | [X]GB1146122 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]US3442078 (NOLAN RICHARD D); | [A]FR2179952 (THERMINVENT AG [CH]); | [A]FR2456838 (SEV MARCHAL); | [A]GB2114292 (DRAYTON CONTROLS) |