EP0142411 - Disc cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanazawa, Yasunori 1-4-5, Motoyokoyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Arai, Haruo 1291-4, Otsu Toyooka-cho Mitsukaido-shi Ibaragi / JP | 03 /
Kuwa, Tadahiro c/o HITACHI MAXELL LTD Shihoryo 1468, Sanoryo Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaragi / JP | [1990/04] |
Former [1985/21] | 01 /
Kanazawa, Yasunori 1-4-5, Motoyokoyama-cho hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Arai, Haruo 1291-4, Otsu Toyooka-cho Mitsukaido-shi Ibaragi / JP | |||
03 /
Kuwa, Tadahiro c/o HITACHI MAXELL LTD Shihoryo 1468, Sanoryo Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaragi / JP | Representative(s) | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402053.7 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | JP19830192816 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: JP 19281683 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142411 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142411 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
G11B17/0436 (EP,US);
G11B23/0321 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [1985/21] | Title | German: | Plattenkassette | [1985/21] | English: | Disc cartridge | [1985/21] | French: | Cartouche de disque | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/05] | 03.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2659574 [ ] (CII HONEYWELL BULL); | DE3130248 [ ] (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | DE3232327 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]); | US4433410 [ ] (SIRYJ BOHDAN W [US], et al) | Examination | EP0137965 |