EP0142422 - Device for counting liquid phases of a partially liquid transparent mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bothorel, Pierre 132, Avenue du Docteur Schweitzer F-33600 Pessac / FR | 02 /
Bernon, Roland 1, Chemin de Cantelaude F-33610 Cestas / FR | 03 /
Gabriel, Guy 26 Bis, rue Phénix Haut-Brion F-33600 Pessac / FR | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/21] | Application number, filing date | 84402150.1 | 24.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | FR19830016973 | 25.10.1983 Original published format: FR 8316973 | [1985/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142422 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142422 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142422 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/04, G01N13/00 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
G01N15/04 (EP,US);
B01F33/452 (EP,US);
G01N33/2823 (EP,US);
G01N2021/5969 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/26] | G01N15/04, G01N15/04, G01N33/28 | ||
Former IPC [1985/21] | G01N21/59, G01N15/04, G01N33/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1985/21] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Zählung der Flüssigkeitsphasen einer teilweise flüssigen und durchsichtigen Mischung | [1985/29] | English: | Device for counting liquid phases of a partially liquid transparent mixture | [1985/29] | French: | Compteur de phases liquides d'un mélange partiellement liquide et transparent | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2551260 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH); | [A]DE3203882 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [Y]US2982170 (FELIX WYSS); | [A]US2971371 (BRENNAN ELMER W, et al); | [A]GB2017936 (ENGLISH CLAYS LOVERING POCHIN) |