EP0142441 - Shuttle cable-car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michel, Max 7, rue de la Chapelle St-Sauveur Aincourt 95510 Vetheuil / FR | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402268.1 | 09.11.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | FR19830017957 | 10.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8317957 | [1985/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142441 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142441 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142441 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B61B7/04, B61B12/00 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
B61B7/04 (EP);
B61B12/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, IT, LI [1985/21] | Title | German: | Pendelverkehr-Kabelbahn | [1985/21] | English: | Shuttle cable-car | [1985/21] | French: | Système de téléphérique à va-et-vient | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.1987 | IT | 30.09.1987 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/13] | AT | 30.09.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH174505 (CONSTAM ERNST [CH]); | [A]US2248960 (LLOYD COLLIS); | [A]CH217921 (VON ROLL AG [CH]); | [A]FR2238626 (AEROTRAIN [FR]); | [A]GB2041305 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]FR2453060 (MASHKOVSKY ARKADY); | [A]FR2496029 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) |