EP0148051 - Method and device for the fixed electrical connection of braided conductors to current supply surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN Rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [1985/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favre-Tissot, Jean-Paul MERLIN GERIN F 38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Kern, Paul, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze 38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Kern, Paul, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402425.7 | 28.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | FR19830020089 | 13.12.1983 Original published format: FR 8320089 | [1985/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148051 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148051 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/04, H01R43/02 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
H01R43/02 (EP,US);
H01R43/04 (EP,US);
H01H1/226 (EP,US);
H01H1/5822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum festen elektrischen Verbinden von Litzen auf Stromzufuhrflächen | [1985/28] | English: | Method and device for the fixed electrical connection of braided conductors to current supply surfaces | [1985/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de connexion électrique fixé de tresses sur des plages d'amenée de courant | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1279798 (AMP INC); | [X]US3067319 (ZAMBOLDI GEORGE R, et al); | [X]GB985597 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]US4224496 (RIORDAN EDWARD D, et al) |