EP0146463 - Compliant lead frame for surface mount semiconductor packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 10400 Ridgeview Court P.O. Box 1500 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 10400 Ridgeview Court P.O. Box 1500 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | ||
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states FAIRCHILD CAMERA & INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 464 Ellis Street Mountain View California 94042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phy, William S. 25616 Moody Road Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1985/26] | Chareyron, Lucien Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402507.2 | 06.12.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830558459 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: US 558459 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146463 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146463 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146463 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/10 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
H05K3/3426 (EP);
H05K7/12 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K1/0271 (EP);
H05K2201/10719 (EP);
H05K2201/10757 (EP);
H05K2201/10818 (EP);
H05K2201/10924 (EP);
H05K2201/10946 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/26] | H05K7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/26] | Title | German: | Elastisches Verbindungselement für die Oberflächenmontage von Halbleiterelementen | [1985/26] | English: | Compliant lead frame for surface mount semiconductor packages | [1985/26] | French: | Elément de connexion élastique pour montage en surface de composants semi-conducteurs | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 21.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4340266 (GROVENDER STEVEN L); | [A]US4449165 (KAUFMAN LANCE R [US]); | [A]GB2115220 (HITACHI LTD) | [A] - IBM TECHNICHAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 12, May 1981, page 5352, New York, US; I. FEINBERG et al.: "High performance single-chip module" |