EP0140810 - Ternary alloy coated steel wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shemenski, Robert Martin 204 Sutton Avenue Northeast North Canton Ohio 44720 / US | 02 /
Kim, Dong Kwang 4194 Big Spruce Drive Akron Ohio 44313 / US | 03 /
Starinshak, Thomas Walter 422 Red Rock Drive Wadsworth Ohio 44281 / US | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Weyland, J.J. Pierre, et al Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre, et al Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1985/36] | Stanley, Michael Gordon GOODYEAR INTERNATIONAL TIRE TECHNICAL CENTER PATENT DEPARTMENT Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1985/19] | Stanley, Michael Gordon GOODYEAR INTERNATIONAL TIRE TECHNICAL CENTER PATENT DEPARTMENT Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 84630131.5 | 07.09.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | US19830530281 | 08.09.1983 Original published format: US 530281 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140810 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140810 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/06, B32B15/02, B32B15/00, B32B25/02, // C08J5/04 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
D07B1/0666 (EP,US);
C25D3/58 (KR);
B32B15/015 (EP,US);
D07B2205/3089 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12924 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
D07B2205/3089, D07B2801/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [1985/19] | Title | German: | Mit einer ternären Legierung überzogener Stahldraht | [1985/19] | English: | Ternary alloy coated steel wire | [1985/19] | French: | Fil d'acier revêtu d'un alliage ternaire | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 19.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3961740 [ ] (NAKAMOTO YUZURU, et al); | DE2856325 [ ] (TOKYO ROPE MFG CO); | FR2445764 [ ] (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | US4255496 [ ] (HAEMERS GUY); | US4347290 [ ] (HAEMERS GUY) | [ ] - ULLMANSS ENCYKLOPADIE DER TECHNISCHEN CHEMIE, 3rd edition, vol. 11, 1960 URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, Munchen page 220 * Ms 60, Ms 63, Ms 67, Ms 72 * |