EP0119959 - Process for producing images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irving, Edward, Dr. 41, Swaffham Road Burwell Cambridge CB5 OAN / GB | 02 /
Smith, Terence James 6A Dickasons Melbourn Royston Hertfordshire SG8 6EL / GB | [1984/39] | Application number, filing date | 84810119.2 | 12.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | GB19830007220 | 16.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8307220 | [1984/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119959 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119959 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/68, G03F7/10 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
G03F7/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bilderzeugung | [1984/39] | English: | Process for producing images | [1984/39] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'images | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 19.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4352723 (MORGAN CHARLES R); | [AD]US3450613 (STEINBERG ISRAEL V); | [A]EP0049940 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4358477 (NOOMEN ARIE, et al) |