EP0130936 - Universal handiwork tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEFINA S.A. 5a Boulevard de Pérolles CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | [1985/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fresard, Marcel Chemin de la Caroline 22 CH-1213 Petit-Lancy (Genève) / CH | 02 /
Plomb, Francis Avenue du Lignon 64 CH-1219 Le Lignon (Genève) / CH | 03 /
Court, Pierre rue de Vélodrome 10 CH-1205 Genève / CH | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Ardin, Pierre PIERRE ARDIN & CIE 22, rue du Mont-Blanc CH-1201 Genève / CH | [1988/21] |
Former [1985/02] | Roth, Pierre PIERRE ARDIN & CIE 22, rue du Mont-Blanc CH-1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 84810207.5 | 02.05.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | CH19830002474 | 06.05.1983 Original published format: CH 247483 | [1985/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130936 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130936 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B27C9/04 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
B27C9/04 (EP,US);
B23D51/02 (EP,US);
B23D51/025 (EP,US);
B23D51/16 (EP,US);
B23D51/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Universalwerkzeugmaschine | [1985/02] | English: | Universal handiwork tool | [1985/02] | French: | Machine universelle pour le bricolage | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR879940 (R S STOKVIS & FILS SOC NOUV ET); | [A]DE814661 (BOEHM FRANZ); | [A]US2784752 (EMRICK HOMER R); | [Y]US2923330 (ROZELL CHARLES J); | [A]US3299918 (HOWEY THOMAS L); | [A]US3387638 (WEST JOHN B); | [A]US3484917 (ROODS JOHN F, et al); | [A]GB2082713 (SUNBEAM CORP) |