EP0160768 - Spectrophotometric apparatus for the non-invasive determination of glucose in body tissues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/46] | Spectrophotometric method and apparatus for the non-invasive determination of glucose in body tissues | ||
[1989/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURABO INDUSTRIES LTD. 14-5 Shimokida-cho Neyagawa Osaka / JP | [1989/12] |
Former [1985/46] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 7 route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dähne, Claus 103, Avenue du Bois de la Chapelle CH-1213 Onex / CH | 02 /
Cross, Daniel 40, route des Acacias CH-1227 Carouge / CH | [1985/46] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco, et al 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 84810212.5 | 04.05.1984 | [1985/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160768 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160768 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/10, G01N21/35 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP);
G01N21/314 (EP);
G01J3/427 (EP);
G01N21/474 (EP);
G01N2201/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | Spektrophotometrisches Gerät zur unblutigen Bestimmung von Glukose in lebendem Gewebe | [1989/18] | English: | Spectrophotometric apparatus for the non-invasive determination of glucose in body tissues | [1989/18] | French: | Dispositif spectrophotométrique pour la détermination, par voie non-invasive, de glucose dans les tissus vivants | [1989/18] |
Former [1985/46] | Spektrophotometrisches Verfahren und Gerät zur unblutigen Bestimmung von Glukose in lebendem Gewebe | ||
Former [1985/46] | Spectrophotometric method and apparatus for the non-invasive determination of glucose in body tissues | ||
Former [1985/46] | Procédé spectrophotométrique et dispositif pour la détermination, par voie non-invasive, de glucose dans les tissus vivants | Examination procedure | 12.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/24] | 15.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3463142 (HARTE RICHARD A); | [AD]US3638640 (SHAW ROBERT F); | [AD]US4169676 (KAISER NILS [DE]); | [A]GB2033575 (ROLFE P); | [AD]GB2075668 (UNIV DUKE); | [A]EP0074428 |